Van Dyken et al v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jay Van Dyken and Shayna Van Dyken
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. d/b/a BRP, Inc. and Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc doing business as BRP, Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv04057
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael R. Holt on behalf of Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Attorney Holt must register for the Northern District of Iowa CMECF through PACER by 2/19/2021. Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2021 (eHolt). (skm)
February 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael R. Holt ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3382266) by Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Michael R. Holt) (Hittler, William)
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott M. Sarason on behalf of Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Attorney Sarason must register for the Northern District of Iowa CMECF through PACER by 2/18/2021. Signed by Clerk on 2/4/2021 (eSarason). (skm)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. See Order for conference bridge instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 2/4/2021. (jag)
February 4, 2021 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael R. Holt by Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Michael R. Holt) (Hittler, William) Modified on 2/4/2021 to note attorney to refile and pay $100 Pro Hac Vice fee (des)
February 4, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott M. Sarason ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3380901) by Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Scott M. Sarason) (Hittler, William)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Defendant Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc (Hittler, William)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc re #6 Answer to Complaint (Hittler, William)
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.(Hittler, William) Modified text on 12/17/2020 (skm).
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the new civil removal actions case packet (eLathrop). (skm)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Jay Van Dyken, Shayna Van Dyken (eLathrop) (skm)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Attorney Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa (eLathrop). (skm)
December 11, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal and #2 LR 7.1 Statement; none found. (skm)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. d/b/a BRP, Inc. (Hittler, William)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Dickinson, case number LACV030617. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3342044), filed by Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. d/b/a BRP, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 2/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hittler, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Dyken et al v. Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Van Dyken
Represented By: Matthew A Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayna Van Dyken
Represented By: Matthew A Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc. d/b/a BRP, Inc.
Represented By: William D Hittler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc doing business as BRP, Inc
Represented By: William D Hittler
Represented By: Michael R Holt
Represented By: Scott M Sarason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?