De Britto Bucco et al v. Western Iowa Tech Community College et al
Plaintiff: Carilyns Sarai Camus Jorquera Jorquera, Nestor Alonso Acevedo Contreras, Cesar Priester Rosa, Jr, Leila Silva Freire Soares, Silmar Da Silva Reis, Marcos Vinicius Morais Pinto, Brian De Souza Melo, Antonio Diego Barbosa Coutinho, Jacqueline De Britto Bucco, Vinicius Assad De Magalhaes and Ana Paula Oliveira De Souza Costa
Defendant: Terry Murrell, Rosana Salgado Burright, Western Iowa Tech Community College, James Zuercher, Terry Yi, Premier Services, Inc d/b/a J&L Staffing and Recruiting, Inc and also d/b/a J&L Enterprises, Inc., Tur-Pak Foods, Inc, Nancy Albrecht, Juline Albert, Royal Canin USA, Inc, Lilly Castro and Premier Services, Inc doing business as J&L Enterprises, Inc agent of J&L Staffing and Recruiting, Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv04001
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Matthew Willems on behalf of Juline Albert, Rosana Salgado Burright, Lilly Castro, Terry Murrell, Western Iowa Tech Community College, Terry Yi, James Zuercher. (Willems, Spencer)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Shoemaker Van Arkel on behalf of Juline Albert, Rosana Salgado Burright, Lilly Castro, Terry Murrell, Western Iowa Tech Community College, Terry Yi, James Zuercher. (Van Arkel, Elizabeth)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M Brennan on behalf of Juline Albert, Rosana Salgado Burright, Lilly Castro, Terry Murrell, Western Iowa Tech Community College, Terry Yi, James Zuercher. (Brennan, Scott)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M Logan on behalf of Juline Albert, Rosana Salgado Burright, Lilly Castro, Terry Murrell, Western Iowa Tech Community College, Terry Yi, James Zuercher. (Logan, Holly)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brock J. Pohlmeier by Defendants Nancy Albrecht, Premier Services, Inc (Pohlmeier, Brock)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** GRANTING #13 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Premier Services, Inc., Juline Albert, Nancy Albrecht, Rosana Salgado Burright, Lilly Castro, Terry Murrell, Royal Canin USA, Inc., Western Iowa Tech Community College, Terry Yi, and James Zuercher - deadline ordered extended for Defendants listed herein until 3/26/2021. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 03/10/2021. (Gollhofer, Jami)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Ana Paula Oliveira De Souza Costa, Vinicius Assad De Magalhaes, Brian De Souza Melo, Jacqueline De Britto Bucco, Nestor Alonso Acevedo Contreras, Antonio Diego Barbosa Coutinho, Silmar Da Silva Reis, Leila Silva Freire Soares, Cesar Priester Rosa, Jr, Marcos Vinicius Morais Pinto. (Attachments: #1 Jacqueline de Britto Bucco, #2 Antonio Diego Barbosa Coutinho, #3 Marcos Vinicius Morais Pinto, #4 Silmar Da Silva Reis, #5 Cesar Priester Rosa, Jr, #6 Vinicius Assad de Magalhaes, #7 Leila Silva Freire Soares, #8 Ana Paula Oliveira de Souza Costa, #9 Brian de Souza Melo) (Kelly, Devin) Modified text on 3/11/2021 (jjh).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth S. Ralph on behalf of Defendant Royal Canin USA, Inc. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 3/10/2021. (jjh)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth S. Ralph, ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number BIANDC-3405178) by Defendant Royal Canin USA, Inc (Ralph, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNRESISTED Motion for Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadlines by Defendant Premier Services, Inc (Millsap, Sarah) Modified on 3/9/2021 (jjh).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Tur-Pak Foods, Inc (Dixon, Matthew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Defendant Premier Services Inc LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/5/2021. (jjh)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J Millsap on behalf of Premier Services, Inc. (Millsap, Sarah)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** GRANTING #9 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant Tur-Pak Foods, Inc. Answer/responsive pleading deadline ordered extended for Defendant Tur-Pak Foods, Inc. to 3/26/2021. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 02/26/2021. (Gollhofer, Jami)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Tur-Pak Foods, Inc (Dixon, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Kelsey R. Heino, Bruce Smith, and James L. Drury, II, from the Goosmann Law Firm (Notice of Appearance filed at Doc. 4) are terminated from representation of Defendant Tur-Pak Foods, Inc., pursuant to the substitution of counsel by attorney Matthew P. Dixon of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP, for Defendant Tur-Pak Foods, Inc., providing notice of appearance by the filing at Doc. 7. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 02/23/2021. (Gollhofer, Jami)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNRESISTED MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Tur-Pak Foods, Inc (Dixon, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** The Clerk of Court shall detach and docket Exhibits A-H (attached to the Notice at Doc. 5, which were inadvertently omitted at initial filing of Complaint) to the Complaint at Doc. 1. Plaintiff shall reserve Complaint and Attachments upon Defendants (if attachments were not originally served with Complaint). Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 2/19/2021. (Gollhofer, Jami)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Nestor Alonso Acevedo Contreras, Antonio Diego Barbosa Coutinho, Silmar Da Silva Reis, Jacqueline De Britto Bucco, Vinicius Assad De Magalhaes, Brian De Souza Melo, Ana Paula Oliveira De Souza Costa, Cesar Priester Rosa, Jr, Leila Silva Freire Soares, Marcos Vinicius Morais Pinto re #1 Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Complaint) (Kelly, Devin)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Defendant Tur-Pak Foods, Inc LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/9/2021. (jjh)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey R Heino on behalf of Tur-Pak Foods, Inc. (Heino, Kelsey)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order (DOCKETED IN ERROR) ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. (jjh) Modified on 1/15/2021 (jjh).
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carilyns Sarai Camus Jorquera Jorquera (Kelly, Devin)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Pursuant to LTS and CJW chambers: Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case. No conflicts identified. (des)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Juline Albert, Nancy Albrecht, Rosana Salgado Burright, Lilly Castro, Terry Murrell, Premier Services, Inc, Royal Canin USA, Inc, Tur-Pak Foods, Inc, Western Iowa Tech Community College, Terry Yi, James Zuercher. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3362214.), filed by Ana Paula Oliveira De Souza Costa, Vinicius Assad De Magalhaes, Brian De Souza Melo, Jacqueline De Britto Bucco, Nestor Alonso Acevedo Contreras, Carilyns Sarai Camus Jorquera Jorquera, Antonio Diego Barbosa Coutinho, Silmar Da Silva Reis, Leila Silva Freire Soares, Cesar Priester Rosa, Jr, Marcos Vinicius Morais Pinto. Scheduling Report due by 4/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Conlin, Roxanne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2021 pursuant to 6 Text Order: #2 Exhibits A-H) (jjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Britto Bucco et al v. Western Iowa Tech Community College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carilyns Sarai Camus Jorquera Jorquera
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nestor Alonso Acevedo Contreras
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Priester Rosa, Jr
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila Silva Freire Soares
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silmar Da Silva Reis
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Vinicius Morais Pinto
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian De Souza Melo
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Diego Barbosa Coutinho
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline De Britto Bucco
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinicius Assad De Magalhaes
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Paula Oliveira De Souza Costa
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Devin Kelly
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Murrell
Represented By: Scott M Brennan
Represented By: Holly M Logan
Represented By: Elizabeth Shoemaker Van Arkel
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosana Salgado Burright
Represented By: Scott M Brennan
Represented By: Holly M Logan
Represented By: Elizabeth Shoemaker Van Arkel
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Iowa Tech Community College
Represented By: Scott M Brennan
Represented By: Holly M Logan
Represented By: Elizabeth Shoemaker Van Arkel
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Zuercher
Represented By: Scott M Brennan
Represented By: Holly M Logan
Represented By: Elizabeth Shoemaker Van Arkel
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Yi
Represented By: Scott M Brennan
Represented By: Holly M Logan
Represented By: Elizabeth Shoemaker Van Arkel
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Services, Inc d/b/a J&L Staffing and Recruiting, Inc and also d/b/a J&L Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tur-Pak Foods, Inc
Represented By: Matthew Dixon
Represented By: Kelsey R Heino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Albrecht
Represented By: Sarah J Millsap
Represented By: Brock Joseph Pohlmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juline Albert
Represented By: Scott M Brennan
Represented By: Holly M Logan
Represented By: Elizabeth Shoemaker Van Arkel
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Canin USA, Inc
Represented By: Elizabeth Ralph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilly Castro
Represented By: Scott M Brennan
Represented By: Holly M Logan
Represented By: Elizabeth Shoemaker Van Arkel
Represented By: Spencer Matthew Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Services, Inc doing business as J&L Enterprises, Inc agent of J&L Staffing and Recruiting, Inc
Represented By: Sarah J Millsap
Represented By: Brock Joseph Pohlmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?