Ward v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Melissa Marie Ward
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv04027
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Kenneth Gillespie on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Gillespie, Matthew)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Marie Ward. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/23/2021. (Forker, Wilford) Modified text to removed incorrect answer deadline on 8/6/2021 (skm).
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (skm)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Melissa Marie Ward. Dismissal Deadline 11/1/2021. (skm)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 7/19/2021. (skm)
July 9, 2021 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Motion referred to Mark A Roberts (no conflicts found). (skm)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Melissa Marie Ward (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint) (Forker, Wilford) Modified text on 7/9/2021 (skm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/9/2021 to attach signed version) (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Marie Ward
Represented By: Wilford L Forker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?