Sidney v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sonia Sidney
Defendant: Sonia Denice Sidney, Kilolo Kijakazi and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv04033
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kizuwanda Curtis on behalf of Sonia Sidney. (Curtis, Kizuwanda)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and File the Certified Administrative Record: The deadline for answering Plaintiff's Complaint and filing the certified administrative record is hereby extended to December 14, 2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/13/2021. (kms)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Certified Administrative Record by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Declaration Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Gillespie, Matthew)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service by Sonia Sidney. (Forker, Wilford) Modified text, event and termed answer deadline as document is not Summons Returned Executed on 8/26/2021 (ksy).
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Kenneth Gillespie on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Gillespie, Matthew)
July 31, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Social Security new case packet) (des)
July 31, 2021 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3502721.), filed by Sonia Sidney. Dismissal Deadline 11/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Forker, Wilford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sidney v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Denice Sidney
Represented By: Wilford L Forker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Sidney
Represented By: Wilford L Forker
Represented By: Kizuwanda Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?