Healthcare Services Group, Inc v. Davenport, Jr Revocable Trust et al
Plaintiff: Healthcare Services Group, Inc
Defendant: Fred Davenport, Jr Revocable Trust, Larry Book, Successor Trustee, John Doe, Jane Doe and Fred Davenport, Jr, Revocable Trust
Case Number: 5:2022cv04045
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Healthcare Services Group, Inc (Board, Jessica)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kms)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 10/7/2022. (kms)
September 7, 2022 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/28/2022. (kms)
September 7, 2022 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (kms)
September 6, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED Complaint against Larry Book, Jane Doe, John Doe, Fred Davenport, Jr Revocable Trust, Successor Trustee, filed by Healthcare Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet ) (Board, Jessica)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3747785.), filed by Healthcare Services Group, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 12/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Summons) (Board, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healthcare Services Group, Inc v. Davenport, Jr Revocable Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthcare Services Group, Inc
Represented By: Jessica A Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Davenport, Jr Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Book
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Successor Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Davenport, Jr, Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?