East Iowa Plastics, Inc v. PI, Inc

Plaintiff: East Iowa Plastics, Inc
Defendant: PI, Inc
Case Number: 6:2012cv02088
Filed: December 10, 2012
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Buchanan
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2016 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff is entitled to attorneys' fees under Iowa law. The parties shall file initial briefs concerning the amount of attorneys' fees, including possible apportionment, by no later than 11/21/2016 and reply briefs by no later than 12/5/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 11/9/2016. (skm)
July 2, 2015 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 171 Motion for Attorney Fees and 176 Amended Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff East Iowa Plastics, Inc; denying 172 Motion for Attorney Fees by Defendant PI, Inc. Plaintiff is awarded a reasonable attorneys' fee of Five Hundred Eighty-Five Thousand Dollars. The clerk shall enter judgment in accordance herewith. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 7/2/2015. (skm)
June 4, 2015 173 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Regarding Conclusions of Law; Judgment: EIP is declared the owner of the Trademark for egg flats by the thermoform method, subject to PI's use of the Trademark for egg flats made by the injection molding method. PI's U.S. Trademark Registration Numbers 3,352,460 and 3,724,368 are cancelled. A copy of these amended Finding and Conclusions will be sent to the USPTO forthwith. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 6/4/15. (ksy)(copy to USPTO)
September 10, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion to Amend. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 9/10/2014. (Stigler, Karo)
August 14, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 84 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court Objections to the June 24, 2014 81 Order Denying PI's 72 Motion to Amend filed by PI, Inc: Remanded to Magistrate Judge for further consideration. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 8/14/2014. (skm)
June 24, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and to Amend PI's Answer. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 6/24/2014. (skm)
June 11, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 6/11/2014. (pac)
May 21, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 5/21/14. (ksy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Iowa Plastics, Inc v. PI, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Iowa Plastics, Inc
Represented By: Glenn L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PI, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?