Conrad v. Fresh Express Incorporated
Plaintiff: Renae Conrad
Defendant: Fresh Express Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2018cv02057
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Buchanan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 UNRESISTED Motion for Additional Time filed by Fresh Express Incorporated. Answer deadline extended for Fresh Express Incorporated to 11/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/09/2018. (jjh)
October 2, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/31/2018. (skm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 UNRESISTED Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Plead by Defendant Fresh Express Incorporated (Zaiger, Mark) Modified text on 10/2/2018 (skm).
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L Zaiger on behalf of Fresh Express Incorporated. (Zaiger, Mark)
September 18, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fresh Express Incorporated. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mml)
August 21, 2018 FEE Receipt: $400.00, receipt number IAN550002066 for New Civil Case Filing Fee by Renae Conrad. (NEF and receipt mailed to Wandro & Associates PC) (mml)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William Marler on behalf of Plaintiff Renae Conrad. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 8/17/2018 (conflicts checked; none found). (skm)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William Marler ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2754825) by Plaintiff Renae Conrad (Arato, Benjamin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status 9/14/2018. (jjh)
August 15, 2018 Set Deadline: New Case Filing fee to be paid by 8/21/2018. Scheduling Report due by 11/13/2018. Deadlines set pursuant to #1 Complaint filed. (skm)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Fresh Express Incorporated, filed by Renae Conrad. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) (Wandro, Steven) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/15/2018 to update case number and division) (jjh). Modified text on 8/15/2018 (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrad v. Fresh Express Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renae Conrad
Represented By: Steven P Wandro
Represented By: Benjamin Granfield Arato
Represented By: William D Marler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Express Incorporated
Represented By: Mark L Zaiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?