Brandes Sr v. City of Waterloo Iowa et al

Plaintiff: Mark Louis Brandes Sr
Defendant: Steve Hoambrecker, City of Waterloo Iowa and Waterloo, Iowa, City of
Case Number: 6:2018cv02089
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures ddl 01/22/19 but not filed with the court: Add Parties ddl 03/20/2019: Amended Pleadings ddl 03/20/2019: Plaintiff's Expert Witness ddl 04/22/2019: Defendants' Expert Witness ddl 06/20/2019: Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts ddl 07/22/2019: Discovery ddl 09/20/2019: Motions ddl 10/21/2019: Trial Ready ddl 05/20/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 01/09/19. (kfs)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 01/08/2019: Order to follow (Court Reporter: FTR Gold) (kfs) (Main Document 10 replaced on 1/8/2019) (kfs).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing - Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 9:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney. See order text for details. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order & Discovery Plan) (src)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mark Louis Brandes Sr (Thorson, Larry)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Upon consent of the parties Mark Louis Brandes Sr, Steve Hoambrecker and Waterloo, Iowa, City of, this case is assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney for final disposition. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 01/03/19. (kfs)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 (DOCKETED IN ERROR) - NOTICE by Steve Hoambrecker, Waterloo, Iowa, City of Consent to Magistrate Judge (Gettman, Bruce) Modified on 1/3/2019 to note that this is a proposed order. (src)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline set for 12/26/2018. (src)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation - Please find the new removal case packet attached to this entry. (src)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Mark Louis Brandes Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (src)
November 26, 2018 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. No conflicts identified with parties, attorneys and KEM. (src)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by City of Waterloo Iowa, Steve Hoambrecker.(Gettman, Bruce)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Black Hawk County, case number LACV135909. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2819030), filed by Steve Hoambrecker, City of Waterloo Iowa. Scheduling Report due by 1/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 LR 81 Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Filing in State Court, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Gettman, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandes Sr v. City of Waterloo Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hoambrecker
Represented By: Bradley Strouse
Represented By: Bruce L Gettman, Jr
Represented By: Bradley M Strouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Waterloo Iowa
Represented By: Bradley Strouse
Represented By: Bruce L Gettman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterloo, Iowa, City of
Represented By: Bruce L Gettman, Jr
Represented By: Bradley M Strouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Louis Brandes Sr
Represented By: Larry J Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?