Teska v. Garner et al
Plaintiff: Bambi Teska
Defendant: James Garner and Precision Air Cargo, Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02009
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by James Garner, Precision Air Cargo, Inc (Robinson, Morgan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint, by James Garner, Precision Air Cargo, Inc.(Robinson, Morgan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bambi Teska (Norris, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant Precision Air Cargo, Inc's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/3/2019. (pac)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bambi Teska. Precision Air Cargo, Inc served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Norris, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James Garner, Precision Air Cargo, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 3/23/2019. (pac)
February 21, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against James Garner and Precision Air Cargo, Inc filed by Bambi Teska. Scheduling Report due by 5/21/2019. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2877481) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Norris, Michael) Modified text on 2/20/2019 (jjh). Modified text on 2/21/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teska v. Garner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bambi Teska
Represented By: Michael T Norris
Represented By: Thomas P Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Garner
Represented By: Morgan Chantel Robinson
Represented By: Jack William Leverenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Air Cargo, Inc
Represented By: Morgan Chantel Robinson
Represented By: Jack William Leverenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?