Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Funke et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Alex Funke, A.K. Funke, Inc. and AK Funke, Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02020
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice. (mmc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Hartung, Katherine) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (mmc).
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Dismissal Pursuant to Local Rule 41(a)(2): Unless appropriate action is taken by 7/23/2019, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Clerk on 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 41) (pac)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Alex Funke served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Hartung, Katherine)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. AK Funke, Inc served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Hartung, Katherine)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Hartung, Katherine)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: AO 121 Form and copy of #1 Complaint mailed to Register of Copyrights this date (des)
March 28, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2019 (des)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AK Funke, Inc, Alex Funke. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
March 28, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorney - none found. (des)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2905678) filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Scheduling Report Deadline 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hartung, Katherine) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Funke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Katherine Joy Hartung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Funke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.K. Funke, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AK Funke, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?