Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Plumley et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Patrick Plumley and John Doe Entity
Case Number: 6:2019cv02021
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S Default Entry re #7 Motion for Default Entry as to Patrick Plumley and John Doe Entity. Signed by Clerk on 06/28/2019. (jjh)(NEF/Default Entry mailed to defaulted parties) Modified text to add service on 7/1/2019 (mmc).
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Entry against John Doe Entity & Patrick Plumley by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hartung, Katherine)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Patrick Plumley served on 4/6/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Hartung, Katherine)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. John Doe Entity served on 4/6/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Hartung, Katherine)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Hartung, Katherine)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mailing Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright to the US Copyright Office. (jjh)
March 28, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2019. (jjh)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe Entity, Patrick Plumley. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
March 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2905689), filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Scheduling Report Due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hartung, Katherine) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (jjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Plumley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Plumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Katherine Joy Hartung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?