Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Dunn et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Cody Winther, Full House Productions, LLC and Robert Dunn
Case Number: 6:2019cv02022
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. (KMS)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Hartung, Katherine) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (KMS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Hartung, Katherine)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: AO 121 Form and copy of #1 Complaint mailed to Register of Copyrights this date. (mmc)
March 28, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2019. (mmc)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mmc)
March 28, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (mmc)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2905692.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Scheduling Report Deadline 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hartung, Katherine) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (mmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Katherine Joy Hartung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Winther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Full House Productions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?