Allstate Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv02030
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Stay. All deadlines are stayed until further order of the court, except the parties shall file a status report by November 6, 2019, updating the status of this matter. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 7/2/2019. (src)
July 1, 2019 Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Stay and Administratively Close by Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mack, Raymond)
June 25, 2019 Filing 65 ANSWER to #60 Amended Complaint by Electrolux Home Products Inc.(Thomas, Mark)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 7/12/19 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 8/16/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 12/6/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 2/7/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 3/6/2020. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. Motions due by 5/1/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 10/2/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 6/21/19. (ksy) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (des)
June 21, 2019 Filing 63 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/21/2019 (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019 pursuant to KEM chambers pursuant to case being stayed before this Order could be filed: #1 Trial Management Order) (des)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Setting Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 1:30 PM (Telephonic Hearing - see dial-in participation instructions in text of Order) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 06/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order). (Gollhofer, Jami)
June 17, 2019 Filing 61 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Electrolux Home Products Inc (Thomas, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 60 AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against Electrolux Home Products Inc, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Mack, Raymond)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re #34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Motion remains pending in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania and is not before the court in this case. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan by 6/14/2019. Updated complaint due on or before 6/14/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 6/7/2019. (des)
June 7, 2019 Filing 58 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Status Conference/Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2019 re #34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Order to follow. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (des)
June 4, 2019 Filing 57 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Setting Hearing; Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/6/2019 at 1:30 PM (Central) (Telephonic Hearing - parties to use dial-in instructions contained in this order to participate) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The hearing will take place using the Court's conference bridge. The parties shall access the hearing by: (1) calling 877-336-1831, (2) enter access code 3495185 #, (3) press # to enter as a participant, (4) enter security code 1831 #. The call will become active upon the "host" (the Court) entering the conference bridge. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 06/04/2019. (Gollhofer, Jami)
June 3, 2019 Filing 56 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate ALLSTATE INSURANCE HOLDINGS, LLC for Allstate Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Sean)
June 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added pursuant to #49 order. (pac)
May 31, 2019 Filing 55 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #52 , #53 and #54 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Raymond Edward Mack, Patrick Anthony Hughes and Andrew George Hunt on behalf of Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company. Upon a review of the Motions and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motions should be granted on the condition attorneys submit CM/ECF Registration Form by 6/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (eAttys Mack, Hughes and Hunt) (des) (des).
May 30, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew G. Hunt ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2949585) by Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (O'Brien, Sean)
May 30, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick A. Hughes ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2949580) by Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (O'Brien, Sean)
May 30, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Raymond E. Mack ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2949571) by Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (O'Brien, Sean)
May 29, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W Thomas on behalf of Electrolux Home Products Inc. (Thomas, Mark)
May 29, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M O'Brien on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Sean)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #46 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge. It is this courts position that the parties consent survives the transfer of venue and, therefore, remains valid. If any party disagrees, that party shall file a motion to revoke consent, along with a supporting brief, on or before 5/31/2019. A resistance, if any, must be filed within 14 days after the motion is served. If no such motion is filed on or before 5/31/2019 this case will be referred to a United States Magistrate Judge in this district to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 5/17/2019. (copy w/NEF to attys Hughes, Hunt, Mack, Nicolson, and Yemma) (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/9/2019: #1 Receipt Confirmations) (des).
May 16, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 6/15/2019 (NEF to attys Hughes, Hunt, Mack, Nicolson, and Yemma). (skm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE to Attorneys Not Admitted to Practice in the Northern District of Iowa (copy w/NEF to attys Hughes, Hunt, Mack, Nicolson, and Yemma). (skm)
May 16, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 5:18-cv-00699. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified text on 5/16/2019, NEF w/copy of Transfer Order mailed to attys) (skm). NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE OF 4/25/2019 THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/25/2019. 4/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #40 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.] Modified text on 5/16/2019 (skm).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF 4/9/2019 THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ECF NO. 35, IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. ON 4/9/19. 4/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION re #40 Amended Complaint by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 41 Letter to Judge Leeson showing cause re subject matter jurisdiction by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 4/9/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 40 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.] Modified on 5/16/2019 (skm).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF 4/5/2019 THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ECF NO. 33, IS GRANTED. ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION, SEE ECF NO. 33, IN A SEPARATE DOCUMENT AS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE WRITTEN CORRESPONDENCE IN LETTER FORM TO THE COURT TO SHOW CAUSE THAT THIS COURT HAS SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OVER THE FOURTH PROPERTY SUBROGATION CLAIM ON OR BEFORE APRIL 8, 2019 AT 12:00PM. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE APRIL 10, 2019 AT 5:00PM. THE PERTIES JOINT REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE SCHEDULING DEADLINES IN THE COURT'S JANUARY 9, 2019 ORDER IS GRANTED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: THE DEADLINE FOR THE COMPLETION OF ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS EXTENDD TO APRIL 26, 2019; THE DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO APRIL 26, 2019; THE DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERT DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO MAY 13, 2019; AND ALL OTHER DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THIS COURT'S ORDER DATE JANUARY 9, 2019, ECF NO 26, REMAIN IN EFFECT. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR., ON 4/5/2019. 4/5/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HUGHES, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Opposition re #34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Counterstatement of Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(YEMMA, MELISSA) Modified on 3/26/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Opposition re #33 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(YEMMA, MELISSA) Modified on 3/25/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H)(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(HUGHES, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A)(HUGHES, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 32 FILED IN ERROR (DT) (dt, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. A Telephonic Pretrial Conference was held on 2/28/2019. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER OF 1/30/2019 THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 28, 2019 (INSTEAD OF MONDAY, FEBRUARY 11, 2019) AT 2:30PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. THE COURT DIRECTS PATRICK A. HUGHES, ESQUIRE TO INITIATE THE CALL. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN ON 1/30/2019. 1/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER OF 1/15/2019 THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON MAY 30, 2019 AT 9:30AM. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN ON 1/15/2019. 1/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER OF 1/15/2019 THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE WILL BE HELD ON FEBRUARY 11, 2019 AT 2:30PM. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 1/15/2019. 1/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF 1/9/2019 THAT THE WITHIN MATTER IS REFERRED TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON OR AFTER APRIL 8, 2019. ETC. IN THE EVENT ANY DEFENDANT HAS NOT YET ENTERED AND APPEARANCE AT THE TIME OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE A COPY OF THIS ORDER UPON THAT DEFENDANT. AS A MATTER OF STANDARD OPERATING PROCEDURE, THE OFFICE OF THE U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES IN THE NEAR FUTURE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/9/2019. 1/9/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: OF 1/9/2019 DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF ALL FACT DISCOVERY APRIL 8, 2019; ETC. DEADLINE FOR FILING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS NO LATER THAN MARCH 11, 2019. ETC. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/5/2019 04:00 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR. ETC. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 6/10/2019 09:00 AM OR AS SOON THEREAFTER AS THE SCHEDULE OF THE COURT PERMITS. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/9/19. 1/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. Pretrial Conference was held on 1/8/19. (DT) Modified on 1/10/2019 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, JANUARY 8, 2019, AT 2:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN U.S. COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, APPENDIX A, JURY TRIAL DEMAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Certificate of Service)(rf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF 10/3/2018 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S ORDER AND OPINION ISSUED AUGUST 3, 2018, ECF NOS. 16 AND 17, THE COURT'S OPINION ISSUED SIMULTANEOUSLY WITH THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF IT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO JOIN AND CONSOLIDATE, ECF NO. 18, AND DEFENDANT ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, ECF NO. 19, IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, ECF NO. 19, IS DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. A. PLAINTIFF'S QUESTION 1 IN ITS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IS DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. ETC. B. PLAINTIFF'S QUESTION 2 IN ITS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S QUESTION 3 IN ITS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION IS GRANTED. ANY RENEWED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AS TO QUESTION 2 SHALL MEET THE FOLLOWING REQUIREMENTS: SUCH MOTION SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 5:00PM, OCTOBER 12, 2018. ETC. PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR CLAIMS "WWW", "XXX", AND "BBB" NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 19, 2018. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON. 10/3/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 OPINION OF 10/3/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. 10/3/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative MOTION to Join and Consolidate filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative MOTION to Join and Consolidate re #17 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service, Brief. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 8/20/2018 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
August 3, 2018 AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 8/17/2018. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 17 OPINION/ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SEVER AND DISMISS, ECF NO. 9, IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER CLAIMS "www", "xxx", and "bbbb", AND DIRECTS PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS FOR THESE CLAIMS NO LATER THAN AUGUST 17, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/3/18. 8/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM/OPINION THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SEVER AND DISMISS, IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. A SEPARATE ORDER FOLLOWS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/3/18. 8/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Supplemental Authority re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Sever and Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction -- Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(YEMMA, MELISSA) Modified on 6/15/2018 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SEVER AND DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY IS GRANTED, AND THE COURT WILL CONSIDER THE SUR-REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/12/18. 4/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST for Leave to File SurReply filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 SurReply, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K)(HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 4/13/2018 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Sever and Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. Certificate of Service. (YEMMA, MELISSA) Modified on 4/10/2018 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Sever and Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, BRIEF AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Response, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 4/3/2018 (afm, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Sever and Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..Certificate of Service and Brief. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA LYNN YEMMA on behalf of ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. with Certificate of Service(YEMMA, MELISSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CHERYL M. NICOLSON on behalf of ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. with Certificate of Service(NICOLSON, CHERYL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
March 2, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon Electrolux Home Products, Inc by Certified Mail on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(HUGHES, PATRICK) Modified on 3/5/2018 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW G. HUNT on behalf of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demanded and Certificate of Service(HUNT, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND E. MACK on behalf of ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demanded and Certificate of Service(MACK, RAYMOND) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER THAT GOVERNS THE CASE AND CONTAINS RULES OF PRACTICE THAT MUST BE FOLLOWED IN ADDITION TO THIS DISTRICT'S LOCAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 2/20/18. 2/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/16/18 (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent ALLSTATE INSURANCE HOLDINGS, LLC for ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 173655.), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Represented By: Cheryl M. Nicolson
Represented By: Melissa Lynn Yemma
Represented By: Mark W Thomas
Represented By: Cheryl M Nicolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick A. Hughes
Represented By: Andrew G. Hunt
Represented By: Raymond E. Mack
Represented By: Andrew George Hunt
Represented By: Sean M O'Brien
Represented By: Raymond Edward Mack
Represented By: Patrick Anthony Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?