Fialkoff et al v. VGM Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Fialkoff and Jeff Knipe
Defendant: VGM Group, Inc, Compass Group USA, Inc and Foodbuy, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv02041
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Compass Group USA, Inc, Foodbuy, LLC. (Mayberry, William)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER re #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William C. Mayberry, #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew D. Atkins, and #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob R. Franchek on behalf of Defendants Compass Group USA, Inc and Foodbuy, LLC. Upon a review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motions should be granted. CM/ECF Registration form due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2019. (jjh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob R. Franchek ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3001800) by Defendants Compass Group USA, Inc, Foodbuy, LLC (Read, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William C. Mayberry ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3001795) by Defendants Compass Group USA, Inc, Foodbuy, LLC (Read, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew D. Atkins ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3001786) by Defendants Compass Group USA, Inc, Foodbuy, LLC (Read, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 RESISTANCE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jason Fialkoff, Jeff Knipe. (Zaiger, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by VGM Group, Inc identifying Other Affiliate DME Association, Inc., Other Affiliate Point Health Centers of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Van G. Miller & Associates, Ltd., Other Affiliate VGM Group Services Ltd., Other Affiliate VGM Insurance Companies of America Ltd., Other Affiliate VGM Insurance Services, Inc. for VGM Group, Inc. (Gamez, Paul)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Foodbuy, LLC (Read, Thomas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Compass Group USA, Inc (Read, Thomas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, & Affirmative Defenses by VGM Group, Inc.(Gamez, Paul)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Compass Group USA, Inc, Foodbuy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Read, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Compass Group USA, Inc, Foodbuy, LLC (Read, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B Read on behalf of Compass Group USA, Inc, Foodbuy, LLC. (Read, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. (conflicts checked, none found). Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (jjh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob W Nelson on behalf of VGM Group, Inc. (Nelson, Jacob)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D Gamez on behalf of VGM Group, Inc. (Gamez, Paul)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER on #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig M. Waugh on behalf of Plaintiffs. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing,the court finds the Motion should be granted. CM/ECF Registration due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2019. (eWaugh) (jjh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig M. Waugh ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2987888) by Plaintiffs Jason Fialkoff, Jeff Knipe (Attachments: #1 Cirtificate of Good Standing) (Zaiger, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant Foodbuy, LLC LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2019. (jjh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Fialkoff, Jeff Knipe. Foodbuy, LLC served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Zaiger, Mark)
July 16, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2019. (jjh)
July 16, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant VGM Group, Inc LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 8/10/2019. (jjh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Fialkoff, Jeff Knipe. Compass Group USA, Inc served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Zaiger, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Fialkoff, Jeff Knipe. VGM Group, Inc served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Zaiger, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Compass Group USA, Inc, Foodbuy, LLC, VGM Group, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status 7/28/2019. (jjh)
June 28, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Compass Group USA, Inc., Foodbuy, LLC, VGM Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2970056.), filed by Jason Fialkoff, Jeff Knipe. Scheduling Report due by 9/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zaiger, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fialkoff et al v. VGM Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGM Group, Inc
Represented By: Jacob W Nelson
Represented By: Paul D Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc
Represented By: Jacob Franchek
Represented By: William C Mayberry
Represented By: Andrew D Atkins
Represented By: Thomas B Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foodbuy, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Franchek
Represented By: William C Mayberry
Represented By: Andrew D Atkins
Represented By: Thomas B Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Fialkoff
Represented By: Mark L Zaiger
Represented By: Craig M Waugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Knipe
Represented By: Mark L Zaiger
Represented By: Craig M Waugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?