Sells et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Robert L Sells and Barbara J Sells
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv02057
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2071
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint by Robert L Sells. Monsanto Company served on 9/16/2019. (Woods, Larry) Modified text on 10/9/2019 (skm).
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 155) MDL No. 2741. This action is transferred to USDC Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/04/2019. (case electronically transferred to Northern District of California) (des)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3010458.), filed by robert L sells, barbara j sells. Scheduling Report due by 11/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sells et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Sells
Represented By: Larry F Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara J Sells
Represented By: Larry F Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?