Eicher v. Mudd, Inc.
Plaintiff: Scott Eicher
Defendant: Mudd, Inc., Targetclick, Mudd Advertising, Mudd Inc and Targetclick Marketing Solutions
Case Number: 6:2019cv02074
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mudd Inc (Furlong, Abbey) Modified text on 1/2/2020 (kms).
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses by Mudd Inc.(Furlong, Abbey) Modified on 12/16/2019 to edit text. (src)
December 9, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 12/30/2019. (src)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation - Please find the new removal case packet attached. (src)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Scott Eicher. (src)
December 9, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (src)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Black Hawk, case number LACV138832. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3077173), filed by Mudd, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 2/4/2020 (Furlong, Abbey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eicher v. Mudd, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mudd, Inc.
Represented By: Abbey C Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Targetclick
Represented By: Abbey C Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mudd Advertising
Represented By: Abbey C Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mudd Inc
Represented By: Abbey C Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Targetclick Marketing Solutions
Represented By: Abbey C Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Eicher
Represented By: Whitney C Judkins
Represented By: Katie Anne Ervin Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?