Ahrens v. Buchanan County Jail
Plaintiff: Michael Jordan Ahrens
Defendant: Buchanan County Jail
Case Number: 6:2020cv02010
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM re #4 Amended Complaint (ksy)(NEF to Plf)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Michael Jordan Ahrens (ksy)(NEF to Plf)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE AMENDED Complaint against Buchanan County Jail filed by Michael Jordan Ahrens. (kms) (NEF mailed to filer)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Jordan Ahrens. (kms) (NEF mailed to filer)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Michael Jordan Ahrens: Plaintiff will be given 30 days from the date of this order to either pay the $400 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If the plaintiff fails to either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days, this case will be dismissed with no further order of the Court. Plaintiff will be given 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint using the standard 1983 form. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days this case will be dismissed with no further order of the Court. The Clerk of Court's Office is directed to send plaintiff the standard motion to proceed in forma pauperis and 1983 forms. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 2/25/2020 (copy w/NEF, IFP and 1983 forms mailed to Plt). (skm)
February 13, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams. Judge Linda R Reade no longer assigned to the case. (ksy)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Buchanan County Jail, filed by Michael Jordan Ahrens. Dismissal Deadline 5/26/2020 (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahrens v. Buchanan County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jordan Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buchanan County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?