Kelly et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Kelly and Susan Kelly
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv02036
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 79 REPLY BRIEF in Support of Plaintiff's #74 MOTION to Strike #32 Other Documents, #15 Pretrial Order filed by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly. (kms)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 7/2/2020. (kms)
June 29, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Excess of Five (5) Pages in Support of Plaintiffs' #74 Motion to Strike Defendants' Experts That Exceed The Five (5) Expert Limit Set Forth By Pretrial Order #15 #328 and to Limit Defendants' Employees From Offering Expert Opinions by Plaintiffs Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit A to Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike, #3 Exhibit B to Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike) (Feldman, Andrew) Modified on 6/29/2020 to add links and text to #15 Pretrial Order and #74 Motion and fix names of attachments (des)
June 24, 2020 Filing 76 RESISTANCE to Motion re #74 MOTION to Strike #32 Other Documents, #15 Pretrial Order filed by Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Penner, Nancy) Modified text on 6/25/2020 (des)
June 10, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Sara E Coopwood on behalf of Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly (ajf)
June 10, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION to Strike #32 Other Documents, #15 Pretrial Order by Plaintiffs Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly Responses due by 6/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (ajf)
June 4, 2020 Filing 73 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #71 and #72 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Andrew J Feldman and Jacob Alex Flint on behalf of Plaintiffs Susan Kelly and Timothy Kelly. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2020. (des)
June 3, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob Alex Flint by Plaintiffs Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IL Cert of Good Standing) (jaf)
June 3, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew J. Feldman by Plaintiffs Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (ajf)
June 3, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Kari L Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Penner, Nancy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Susan M Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Penner, Nancy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Christy D Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Penner, Nancy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney William M Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Penner, Nancy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney David B Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Penner, Nancy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D Houghton on behalf of Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Houghton, Robert)
June 3, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy J Penner on behalf of Ethicon, Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Penner, Nancy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE to Attorneys Not Admitted to Practice in the USDC for the Northern District of Iowa as to Kelly et al v Ethicon Inc et al (copy w/nef to non-ecf attys) (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2020: #1 Receipt Confirmations) (des).
June 2, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
June 2, 2020 Filing 62 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-11412. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE Modified on 6/2/2020 (des)
May 26, 2020 Filing 61 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Supp of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2723) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3563) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (4201) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (8557) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (8644) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp tp Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (8902) Order re Motion to Amend PTO 337)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers)(msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 60 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2063) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2063) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2069) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2184) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2255) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2695) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Juan Carlos Felix, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8481) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Juan Carlos Felix, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8608) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Juan Carols Felix)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 59 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6886) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6890) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (6979) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8506) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8610) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp tp Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Sand)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 58 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3610) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3612) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3757) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3848) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6262) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Elizabeth Mueller, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8498) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8636) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 57 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2041) - Pls Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2043) - Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2136) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2234) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2713) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Michael Woods, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2927) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3051) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (4213) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Michael Woods, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8518) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8632) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Woods)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 56 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2200) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2642) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (6398) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8519) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8588) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 55 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17- Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 54 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2664) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (4180) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Peggy Pence, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8531) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8596) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 53 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2029) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2031) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2169) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2212) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2681) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Margolis, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2832) - Defs' Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2833) - Defs' Mem in Support of Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2904) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (4181) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Margolis, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8556) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8590) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 52 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2251) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2710) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (4171) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 1- Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 2- Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 3- Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 4- Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 5- Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 6- Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 7- Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 8- Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 9- Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8076) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8322) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (8512) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (8585) - Notice of Adoption of Plfs' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers)(msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 51 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1- Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 50 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce RosenzweigMDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2668) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4186) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (4186-1) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (6519) Memorandum Opinion and Order - Daubert Motion re Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (8541) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (8599) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 49 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 5/28/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/27/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/14/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 47 REPLY by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly to #44 Response In Opposition. (Feldman, Andrew) (Modified on 9/6/2019 to remove link to #42 motion) (msa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly in opposition to #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Feldman, Andrew) (Modified on 8/30/2019 to remove link to #41 Memorandum in Support)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly in opposition to #38 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #42 MOTION by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Michael P. Woods, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly in support of #42 MOTION by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Michael P. Woods, M.D. (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Michael P. Woods, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in Support of #38 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 37 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #35 Notice to Take or Amend Deposition (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Joshua Allen Kelly; Sean Arthur Kelly; Brian Robert Kelly; JoHanna Marie Knap-Serek; Mary Doering; Melissa Wilcox on TBD at TBD (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 35 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly of Dr. Michael P. Woods on July 26th, 2019 at 9:00 am CST (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly of Dr. Michael P. Woods on July 26th, 2019 at 9:00a CST (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 33 OBJECTIONS to #31 Notice of Deposition of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants' Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on 7/22/2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly for Amended Expert Witness Disclosures and Expert Report. (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly for Expert Witness Disclosures and Expert Report. (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly for Plaintiffs Responses to Ethicon, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johnson & Johnson for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sara E. Coopwood on behalf of Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly. (Coopwood, Sara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly for First Sets of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production of Documents. (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly to #20 Notice of Deposition of Timothy Kelly. (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly to #19 Notice of Deposition of Susan Kelly. (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Timothy Kelly on 4/30/19 at 1:00 p.m. CDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Susan Kelly on 4/30/19 at 9:00 a.m. CDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS to #16 Notice of Deposition of Susan Kelly, by Susan Kelly and Timothy Kelly (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Andrew J. Feldman on behalf of Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly. (Feldman, Andrew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Susan Kelly on 4/26/19 at 9:00 a.m. CST (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER # 328 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 11 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 11 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 11 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
October 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 3/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 10/31/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 4424 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/27/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
June 20, 2017 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Susan Kelly, Timothy Kelly. (Flint, Jacob) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
October 11, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting MOTION filed in MDL 2327 by Jacob A. Flint, Andrew W. Callahan and Flint & Associates LLC for Change of Attorney Information. The Clerk is instructed to update the information, as set forth in the Motion, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which said attorney is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/17/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
February 6, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 26, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 5, 2014 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. ERROR: Date filed incorrect. CORRECTION: Date filed edited to be 02/28/2014. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
March 5, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 106 (Daniel J. Christensen and MedStar Funding, LCs Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoenas Issued by Ethicon, Inc.) entered on 03/04/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]
February 28, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3046096. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kg) (Modified on 3/5/2014 to correct date filed.) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Kelly
Represented By: Andrew J Feldman
Represented By: Sara E Coopwood
Represented By: Jacob Alex Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Kelly
Represented By: Andrew J Feldman
Represented By: Sara E Coopwood
Represented By: Jacob Alex Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: Robert D Houghton
Represented By: Nancy J Penner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc
Represented By: Susan M Robinson
Represented By: Christy D Jones
Represented By: William M Gage
Represented By: David B Thomas
Represented By: Kari L Sutherland
Represented By: Robert D Houghton
Represented By: Nancy J Penner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?