Rigdon v. Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Travis Rigdon
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard, Inc. and CR Bard, Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv02053
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc (Lindenfeld, Noah)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc.(Lindenfeld, Noah)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 *TEXT ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noah Lindenfeld and #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John S. Gearan on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and CR Bard, Inc. Upon a review of the Motions, the court finds that the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020. (skm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc. (Lindenfeld, Noah)
August 14, 2020 Set Deadline: Defendants' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/14/2020. (skm)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M Lederer on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc. (Lederer, Gregory)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc (Lindenfeld, Noah)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiff's Complaint For Damages and Jury Trial Demand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc.(Lindenfeld, Noah)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John S. Gearan by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc (Gearan, John)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noah Lindenfeld by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard, Inc (Lindenfeld, Noah)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C. R. Bard, Inc.. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
July 20, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. (No conflicts identified) (ksy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3248997.), filed by Travis Rigdon. Scheduling Report due by 10/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cook, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigdon v. Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Rigdon
Represented By: James H Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Represented By: John S Gearan, III
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard, Inc
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: John S Gearan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?