Thomas v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Dion Thomas
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 6:2020cv02061
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Dion Thomas. Signed by Clerk on 9/23/2020. (copy mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Pro Se Motion to Dismiss filed by Dion Thomas: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the movants 2241 motion is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 9/23/2020. (copy mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION to Dismiss by Petitioner Dion Thomas. Responses due by 10/5/2020. (NEF mailed to Petitioner per PSLC) (jjh)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Correspondence by Dion Thomas (ksy)(NEF, Petition and docket sheets in 20cv2061; 16cv2006; and 11cr2046 mailed to Plf)(PSLC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Dion Thomas. Dismissal Deadline 11/30/2020 (ksy)(NEF to Plf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Lisa C Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?