Bohn v. United States Attorney
Plaintiff: Jonathan W Bohn
Defendant: Unknown Assistant United States Attorney
Case Number: 6:2021cv02006
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jonathan W Bohn (PSLC) (NEF to Plf) (jag)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Jonathan W Bohn: Plaintiff will be given thirty days from the date of this order to either pay the complete $402 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff will be given 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. If plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within 30 days, this case will be dismissed under Title 28, United States Code, Section 1915A with no further order of the Court. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 2/11/2021. (order, 1983 and IFP forms mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Attorney, filed by Jonathan W Bohn. Dismissal Deadline 5/5/2021. (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (Letter and IFP form mailed to Pltf) (jjh) Modified on 1/27/2021 (jjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohn v. United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Assistant United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan W Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?