DeBower v. Spencer et al
Plaintiff: Mark DeBower
Defendant: Wagner Trucking, Inc, Skeeter Express Specialized, LLC and Wendy Dawn Spencer
Case Number: 6:2021cv02010
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan and Consent To Proceed Before A Magistrate by Defendants Skeeter Express Specialized, LLC, Wendy Dawn Spencer, Wagner Trucking, Inc (Blades, Charles)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mark DeBower. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B) (Toenjes, Bruce)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned to the case as presider. (per KEM chambers) (kms)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by Skeeter Express Specialized, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended (Blades, Charles)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESISTANCE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Skeeter Express Specialized, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Blades, Charles)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement for Wagner Trucking, Inc by Skeeter Express Specialized, LLC, Wendy Dawn Spencer, Wagner Trucking, Inc (Blades, Charles)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement for Skeeter Express Specialized LLC by Skeeter Express Specialized, LLC, Wendy Dawn Spencer, Wagner Trucking, Inc (Blades, Charles)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadline pursuant to Local Rule as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Response due by 3/3/2021. (Gollhofer, Jami)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mark DeBower (Toenjes, Bruce)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Mark DeBower Responses due by 3/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand) (Toenjes, Bruce)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant by Skeeter Express Specialized, LLC.(Blades, Charles)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED STATE Court Answer with Jury Demand to #4 Amended State Court Petition by Wendy Dawn Spencer, Wagner Trucking, Inc (sgw)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATE Court Answer with Jury Demand to #3 State Court Petition by Wendy Dawn Spencer, Wagner Trucking, Inc (sgw)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (sgw)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED STATE Court Petition and Demand For Jury Trial by Mark DeBower (sgw)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Mark DeBower (sgw)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 3/7/2021. (sgw)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 2/26/2021. (sgw) Modified to Correct Deadline on 2/5/2021 (sgw).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (sgw)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Bremer County, Iowa District Court, case number LACV006256. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3381374), filed by Skeeter Express Specialized, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 4/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Def's Notice of Removal Pursuant to Local Rule 81, #2 Exhibit Defendant Wagner Trucking Inc's Consent to Removal and Defendant Wendy Dawn Spencer's Consent to Removal) (Blades, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeBower v. Spencer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagner Trucking, Inc
Represented By: Charles A Blades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skeeter Express Specialized, LLC
Represented By: Charles A Blades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Dawn Spencer
Represented By: Charles A Blades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark DeBower
Represented By: Bruce J Toenjes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?