Brubaker, et al v. Kuper, et al
Plaintiff: John Eric Brubaker and Janeice E Brubaker
Defendant: Teresa Yegge, Douglas R Yegge, Reed B Kuper, Yegge, Inc, CUSB Bank and Ashley Kuper
Case Number: 6:2021cv02031
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Janeice E Brubaker, John Eric Brubaker (Critelli, Nicholas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Yegge, Inc (Bruhn, James)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint,, by Douglas R Yegge, Teresa Yegge, Yegge, Inc.(Bruhn, James)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #1 Complaint,, by Ashley Kuper, Reed B Kuper.(Johnson, Andrew)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janeice E Brubaker, John Eric Brubaker. Teresa Yegge served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Critelli, Nicholas)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janeice E Brubaker, John Eric Brubaker. Yegge, Inc served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Critelli, Nicholas)
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janeice E Brubaker, John Eric Brubaker. Douglas R Yegge served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Critelli, Nicholas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Kuper. Ashley Kuper waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Critelli, Nicholas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Eric Brubaker, Janeice E Brubaker. Reed B Kuper waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Critelli, Nicholas)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Eric Brubaker, Janeice E Brubaker. CUSB Bank waiver sent on 5/11/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Critelli, Nicholas)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 6/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 AO 85) (ksy)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CUSB Bank, Reed B Kuper, Douglas R Yegge, Teresa Yegge, Yegge, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CUSB Bank, Reed B Kuper, Douglas R Yegge, Teresa Yegge, Yegge, Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3448377.), filed by John Eric Brubaker, Janeice E Brubaker. Scheduling Report due by 8/9/2021 (Critelli, Nicholas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2021: #1 Exhibit 1 Agrement to Purchase, #2 Exhibit 2 - Facility Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 Appraisal, #4 Exhibit 4 CUSB Appraisal, #5 Exhibit 5 Circo Virus Text 1, #6 Exhibit 6 Circo Virus Text 2, #7 Exhibit 7 Tender, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brubaker, et al v. Kuper, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eric Brubaker
Represented By: Lylea D Critelli
Represented By: Nicholas V Critelli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janeice E Brubaker
Represented By: Lylea D Critelli
Represented By: Nicholas V Critelli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Yegge
Represented By: James D Bruhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R Yegge
Represented By: James D Bruhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed B Kuper
Represented By: Andrew C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yegge, Inc
Represented By: James D Bruhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUSB Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Kuper
Represented By: Andrew C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?