Simmons et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al--PER #18 ORDER STATUS REPORT DUE EVERY 60 DAYS
Plaintiff: Levita Simmons, Jeffrey Orvis, Estate of Arthur Scott and Estate of James Orvis
Defendant: David Scott, Bret Tapken, Ramiz Mujelic, Steven R. Stouffer, Elizabeth Croston, Dean Banks, Mary A. Oleksink, Hamdija Beganovic, Noel W. White, Scott Walston, John H. Tyson, Tom Brower, Tyson Foods, Inc., John Casey, Tyson Pet Products, Tom Hart, Cody Brustkern, Tyson Fresh Meats Group, Tyson Foods, Inc doing business as Tyson Pet Products doing business as Tyson Fresh Meats Group, John H Tyson, Noel W White, Steven R Stouffer, Mary A Oleksink and Unknown
Case Number: 6:2021cv02036
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Dean Banks, Hamdija Beganovic, Tom Brower, Cody Brustkern, John Casey, Elizabeth Croston, Tom Hart, Ramiz Mujelic, Mary A Oleksink, David Scott, Steven R Stouffer, Bret Tapken, John H Tyson, Tyson Foods, Inc, Scott Walston, Noel W White re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court Notice of Intent to Resist Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Driscoll, Kevin)
July 21, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Orvis, Levita Simmons Responses due by 8/4/2021 (Keen, Roshna) Modified on 7/21/2021 to terminate motion per PDY, case stayed pursuant to order at #18 ; NEFs regenerated (kms).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Staying Case pending the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals final resolution of the consolidated appeal in Buljic and Fernandez. Furthermore, for court purposes, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case administratively, subject to being reopened upon the conclusion of the Eighth Circuits final ruling in Buljic and Fernandez. The parties are DIRECTED to notify the court when the case needs to be reopened. Additionally, the parties are DIRECTED to file a joint status report updating the court regarding the status of the appeal at sixty-day intervals until the Eighth Circuit issues a final ruling. Following the Eighth Circuits ruling, and, upon reopening by the parties, the court will set, if necessary, by order, new deadlines for Plaintiffs response to Defendants motions to dismiss. The Motion for an Extension of Time to Resist Defendants Motion to Dismiss (docket no. #15 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 7/13/2021. (des)
July 13, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Tyson Foods, Inc (Driscoll, Kevin) Modified text on 7/14/2021 (des)
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Driscoll, Kevin) Modified text on 7/14/2021 (des)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to Resist Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Orvis, Levita Simmons (Roche, Katie)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Roshna Bala Keen, #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark Loevy-Reyes and #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gayle Horn on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Orvis and Levita Simmon. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 7/2/2021. (des)
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gayle Horn ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3483813) by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Orvis, Levita Simmons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing) (Horn, Gayle)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark Loevy-Reyes ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3483637) by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Orvis, Levita Simmons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing) (Loevy-Reyes, Mark)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Roshna Bala Keen ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3483617) by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Orvis, Levita Simmons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing) (Keen, Roshna)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine Roche on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeffrey Orvis and Levita Simmons. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 7/01/2021. (des)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine Roche ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3482866) by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Orvis, Levita Simmons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing) (Roche, Katie)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 JOINDER in Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hamdija Beganovic, Cody Brustkern, John Casey, Tom Hart, Bret Tapken. (Klinefeldt, Nicholas)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Yoshimura on behalf of Hamdija Beganovic, Cody Brustkern, John Casey, Tom Hart, Bret Tapken. (Yoshimura, David)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Hamdija Beganovic, Cody Brustkern, John Casey, Tom Hart, Bret Tapken Responses due by 7/12/2021 (Klinefeldt, Nicholas) Modified on 6/29/2021 to note attorney filed a joinder as a motion in error and will refile (des)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Driscoll, Kevin)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Dean Banks, Tom Brower, Elizabeth Croston, Ramiz Mujelic, Mary A Oleksink, David Scott, Steven R Stouffer, John H Tyson, Scott Walston, Noel W White (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Driscoll, Kevin)
June 23, 2021 Case Reassigned (Per LRR) to Judge Linda R Reade. Chief Judge Leonard T Strand no longer assigned to the case. No conflicts identified. (des)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des) (Main Document 3 added on 6/22/2021) (ksy).
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition and Jury Trial Demand by Plaintiffs Jeffrey Orvis and Levita Simmons (des)
June 22, 2021 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
June 22, 2021 Set Deadline: Defendant Tyson Foods Inc LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/13/2021 (des)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Black Hawk County, case number LACV142570. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3475151), filed by Steven R. Stouffer, Tyson Fresh Meats Group, Ramiz Mujelic, Mary A. Oleksink, David Scott, Tyson Pet Products, Noel W. White, Tom Brower, Elizabeth Croston, Scott Walston, John H. Tyson, Dean Banks, Tyson Foods, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 8/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 LR81 Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Driscoll, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al--PER #18 ORDER STATUS REPORT DUE EVERY 60 DAYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Scott
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Tapken
Represented By: Nicholas A Klinefeldt
Represented By: David Yoshimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramiz Mujelic
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R. Stouffer
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Croston
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Banks
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A. Oleksink
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamdija Beganovic
Represented By: Nicholas A Klinefeldt
Represented By: David Yoshimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel W. White
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walston
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Tyson
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Brower
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Casey
Represented By: Nicholas A Klinefeldt
Represented By: David Yoshimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Pet Products
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Hart
Represented By: Nicholas A Klinefeldt
Represented By: David Yoshimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Brustkern
Represented By: Nicholas A Klinefeldt
Represented By: David Yoshimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats Group
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc doing business as Tyson Pet Products doing business as Tyson Fresh Meats Group
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Tyson
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel W White
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R Stouffer
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A Oleksink
Represented By: Andrew Patton
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levita Simmons
Represented By: Elizabeth Araguas
Represented By: Gayle Horn
Represented By: Katie Roche
Represented By: Mark Loevy-Reyes
Represented By: Roshna Bala Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Orvis
Represented By: Elizabeth Araguas
Represented By: Gayle Horn
Represented By: Katie Roche
Represented By: Mark Loevy-Reyes
Represented By: Roshna Bala Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Arthur Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of James Orvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?