Patterson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David Patterson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Ssaogcomms
Case Number: 6:2023cv02024
Filed: March 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 423 Social Security Act (Disability Insurance Benefit Payments)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2023 Filing 9 SOCIAL Security Briefing Schedule Order. Pursuant to 42 USC Sec. 405(g) and Local Rule 16(h), this case will be submitted to the Court as follows: Plaintiffs Brief due by 6/5/2023. Defendants Brief due by 7/5/2023. Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 7/19/2023. Signed by Clerk on 5/5/2023. (rjs)
May 4, 2023 Filing 8 SOCIAL Security Transcript Filed beginning with part 1 of 31 - Certification Page (Attachments: #1 transcript 2 of 31 - Court Transcript Index, #2 transcript 3 of 31 - Documents Related to Administrative Process, #3 transcript 4 of 31 - Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 transcript 5 of 31 - Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 transcript 6 of 31 - Non Disability Related Development, #6 transcript 7 of 31 - Disability Related Development, #7 transcript 8 of 31 - Medical Records Part 1, #8 transcript 9 of 31 - Medical Records Part 2, #9 transcript 10 of 31 - Medical Records Part 3, #10 transcript 11 of 31 - Medical Records Part 4, #11 transcript 12 of 31 - Medical Records Part 5, #12 transcript 13 of 31 - Medical Records Part 6, #13 transcript 14 of 31 - Medical Records Part 7, #14 transcript 15 of 31 - Medical Records Part 8, #15 transcript 16 of 31 - Medical Records Part 9, #16 transcript 17 of 31 - Medical Records Part 10, #17 transcript 18 of 31 - Medical Records Part 11, #18 transcript 19 of 31 - Medical Records Part 12, #19 transcript 20 of 31 - Medical Records Part 13, #20 transcript 21 of 31 - Medical Records Part 14, #21 transcript 22 of 31 - Medical Records Part 15, #22 transcript 23 of 31 - Medical Records Part 16, #23 transcript 24 of 31 - Medical Records Part 17, #24 transcript 25 of 31 - Medical Records Part 18, #25 transcript 26 of 31 - Medical Records Part 19, #26 transcript 27 of 31 - Medical Records Part 20, #27 transcript 28 of 31 - Medical Records Part 21, #28 transcript 29 of 31 - Medical Records Part 22, #29 transcript 30 of 31 - Medical Records Part 23, #30 transcript 31 of 31 - Medical Records Part 24) (Sides, James)
April 25, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James D Sides on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Sides, James)
March 9, 2023 Filing 6 DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the case packet used in Social Security cases. (jag)
March 9, 2023 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by David Patterson. Dismissal Deadline 6/20/2023 (jag)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is ordered to file the complaint and docket the notice of social security case service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/9/2023. (jag)
March 9, 2023 Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules of Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summons shall issue. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/9/2023, answer due 5/8/2023. (jag)
March 8, 2023 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER ONLY granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryan Konoski. Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Bryan Konoski is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff David Patterson on the condition that Mr. Konoski register for NextGen by 3/22/2023. Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2023. (eKonoski) (jag)
March 8, 2023 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (jag)
March 7, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryan Konoski ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3874323) by Plaintiff David Patterson (Carter, Ruth)
March 7, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Carter, Ruth) Modified to change to Motion and term dismissal deadline given wrong event used on 3/7/2023 (jag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ssaogcomms
Represented By: Ssaogcomms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Patterson
Represented By: Ruth M Carter
Represented By: Bryan Konoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: James D Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?