Downs et al v. BASF Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Downs, Cheryl A. Downs and Linda Huntley
Defendant: Symrise, Inc., Berje, Inc., Penta Manufacturing Co., Inc., BASF Corporation, John Does 1-20, Givaudan, Sensient Flavors International, Inc., Centrome, Inc., Fleurchem, Inc., Phoenix Aromas & Essential Oils Holdings, Inc., International Flavors & Fragrances, Inc., Sigma-Aldrich, Inc., FONA International, Inc., Citrus & Allied Essences, LTD, O'Laughlin Industries, Inc., DSM Food Specialties USA, Inc., Kerry Flavor Systems US, LLC, Firmenich Incorporated and Carmi Flavor and Fragrance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00033
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Symrise, Inc. served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Symrise, Inc. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Sigma-Aldrich, Inc. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Sensient Flavors International, Inc. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Penta Manufacturing Co., Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. O'Laughlin Industries, Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Kerry Flavor Systems US, LLC served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Kerry Flavor Systems US, LLC served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. International Flavors & Fragrances, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Givaudan served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. FONA International, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. FONA International, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Firmenich Incorporated served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. DSM Food Specialties USA, Inc. served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. DSM Food Specialties USA, Inc. served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Carmi Flavor and Fragrance Company, Inc. served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Berje, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 9, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. BASF Corporation served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Smith, Jay)
November 6, 2018 4 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice M. Alan Holcomb. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/6/2018. (kjw)
November 6, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3643236 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by International Flavors & Fragrances, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Michael Alan Holcomb)(Holcomb, M.)
November 2, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint by International Flavors & Fragrances, Inc..(Wright, Jeff)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3595114., filed by Cheryl A. Downs, Kenneth Downs, Linda Huntley. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/11/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/11/2018.(Smith, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs et al v. BASF Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symrise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berje, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penta Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Givaudan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensient Flavors International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centrome, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleurchem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Aromas & Essential Oils Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Flavors & Fragrances, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff W Wright
Represented By: M. Alan Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigma-Aldrich, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FONA International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrus & Allied Essences, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Laughlin Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSM Food Specialties USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Flavor Systems US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firmenich Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmi Flavor and Fragrance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Downs
Represented By: Jay Madison Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Downs
Represented By: Jay Madison Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Huntley
Represented By: Jay Madison Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?