Doyle v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Wynee Doyle
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00034
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: At the request of counsel, the Status Conference set for November 27, 2018, is continued. The next Status Conference is set for 2/26/2019 at 09:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Counsel shall call 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. By 4:00 p.m. on February 21, 2019, counsel shall file a Joint Agenda indicating issues to be discussed. If there are no issues to be discussed, counsel shall file a status report and ask that the Status Conference be continued. Final Pretrial conference remains set for 10:00 a.m. on November 19, 2019; four-day jury trial remains set for December 2, 2019, at the U.S. Courthouse in Council Bluffs, Iowa. Counsel shall contact the chambers of Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Helen Adams if they would like to schedule a court-sponsored settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 11/19/2018. (mlr)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 10:00 a.m. on November 27, 2018, by telephone call. Counsel shall call the Court's AT&T conference line at 1-866-590-5055 and enter code 7013731 at the prompt. By November 21, 2018, the parties shall file a Joint Agenda, including all issues that need to be discussed. If there are no pending issues, they may ask for the Status Conference to be continued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/4/2018. (mlr)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Four-day Jury trial set for December 2, 2019 at the U.S. Courthouse in Council Bluffs, Iowa. Final pretrial conference set for 10:00 a.m. on November 19, 2019, before the undersigned at the U.S. Courthouse in Council Bluffs, Iowa. See Order #6 for instructions to the parties regarding requirements for the final pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/4/2018. (mlr)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #4 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Four-day Jury Trial set for 12/2/2019 09:00 AM in Council Bluffs before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2019 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Status Conference set for 11/27/2018 10:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer. Initial Disclosures Deadline 10/26/2018. Motions to Add Parties due by 12/7/2018. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/7/2018. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 1/11/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/8/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 4/12/2019. Discovery Deadline 6/14/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 10/4/2018. (mlr)
October 4, 2018 Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer added as presider. Judge Stephanie M. Rose no longer assigned to case. (vr)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: re #4 consent to trial by Magistrate Judge. It is ORDERED that this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to the consent of the parties to conduct all further proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 10/3/2018. (mkh)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Weston, Benjamin)
September 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 10/12/2018. Emailed packet to defense counsel. (don)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Weston, Benjamin)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Weston, Benjamin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust from Pottawattamie County District Court, case number LACV118224. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3603450., filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement)(Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynee Doyle
Represented By: Michael G Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?