Benda v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, et al.,

Plaintiff: Margaret Benda
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Parker Hannifin Corporation's Group Disability Plan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00009
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Parker Hannifin Corporation's Group Disability Plan.(Sanz, Kathleen)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bruce Hearey; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kathleen Sanz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 5/23/2019. (slg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3827723 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Parker Hannifin Corporation's Group Disability Plan. (Sanz, Kathleen)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3827717 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Parker Hannifin Corporation's Group Disability Plan. (Hearey, Bruce)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. Martin on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Parker Hannifin Corporation's Group Disability Plan (Martin, Patrick)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation's Group Disability Plan, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston to and including May 27, 2019, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/29/2019. (mlr)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Parker Hannifin Corporation's Group Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Patrick)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Benda. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Neifert, Jason)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (don)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Margaret Benda against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3776139., filed by Margaret Benda. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/24/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/24/2019.(Neifert, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benda v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Patrick R. Martin
Represented By: Kathleen J. Sanz
Represented By: Bruce G Hearey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation's Group Disability Plan
Represented By: Patrick R. Martin
Represented By: Kathleen J. Sanz
Represented By: Bruce G Hearey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Benda
Represented By: Jason David Neifert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?