Christopher Michael & Associates, Inc. v. Color Ink Corporation
Plaintiff: Christopher Michael & Associates, Inc. and Cimron, Inc.
Defendant: Color Inc Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00010
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 49:11706
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Christopher Michael & Associates, Inc., Cimron, Inc.. (Hartnett, Kathryn)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Color Inc Corporation.(Moran, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Color Inc Corporation., filed by Christopher Michael & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Hartnett, Kathryn)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Color Inc Corporation. (Moran, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Color Inc Corporation.(Moran, Michael)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 5/16/2019. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 5/16/2019. (vr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Color Inc Corporation LOCAL RULE 81 NOTICE (Moran, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COLOR INK CORPORATION, d/b/a ) DALLAS JOHNSON GREENHOUSE, ) an Iowa Corporation from IOWA DISTRICT COURT FOR POTTAWATTAMIE COUNTY, case number LACV117245. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3793143., filed by COLOR INK CORPORATION, d/b/a ) DALLAS JOHNSON GREENHOUSE, ) an Iowa Corporation. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition)(Moran, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Michael & Associates, Inc. v. Color Ink Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Color Inc Corporation
Represented By: Michael Lawton Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Michael & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn L. Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cimron, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn L. Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?