Fennell v. Van Houten et al
Plaintiff: David Douglas Fennell
Defendant: Dan Van Houten, John Doe 2, NP Dodge Real Estate Sale, Inc. and John Doe 1
Case Number: 1:2020cv00015
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 41:6503
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by NP Dodge Real Estate Sale, Inc., Dan Van Houten re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Serangeli, William)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NP Dodge Real Estate Sale, Inc., Dan Van Houten. Responses due by 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Serangeli, William)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Service by NP Dodge Real Estate Sale, Inc., Dan Van Houten. (Serangeli, William)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendants NP Dodge Real Estate, Inc. and Dan Van Houten shall have until June 16, 2020 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (jeb)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William B Serangeli on behalf of NP Dodge Real Estate Sale, Inc., Dan Van Houten (Serangeli, William)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by NP Dodge Real Estate Sale, Inc., Dan Van Houten.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Serangeli, William)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by NP Dodge Real Estate Sale, Inc., Dan Van Houten. (Serangeli, William)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 John Doe 1, #2 John Doe 2, #3 NP Dodge Real Estate Sale, Inc.) (kmc)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying any request for immediate injunctive relief contained in #1 pro se Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 5/8/2020. (NDC)
May 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number IAS400022550 by David Douglas Fennell. (kjw)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Douglas Fennell. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 8/5/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (vr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fennell v. Van Houten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Van Houten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Dodge Real Estate Sale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Douglas Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?