Opitz v. Conagra Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Danielle Opitz
Defendant: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00011
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 0301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/3/2021. (jeb)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 9/19/2022 9:00 AM for estimated 4 days in Council Bluffs Courthouse before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2022 10:00 AM in Council Bluffs Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Initial Disclosures due by 6/25/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/27/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 7/27/2021. Plaintiff Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/27/2021. Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/27/2021. Plaintiff Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/22/2021. Discovery Deadline 1/28/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/3/2021. (jeb)
June 2, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/2/2021. Attorney Lewis Galloway appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Jenna Brofsky appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 16 minutes. (jeb)
May 28, 2021 Filing 17 Errata re #16 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan. (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica)
May 27, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica)
May 24, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Conagra Brands, Inc.. (Glenn, Ryann)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jenna Brofsky. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 5/21/2021. (slg)
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4493747 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Conagra Brands, Inc.. (Brofsky, Jenna)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held on June 2, 2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by May 27, 2021. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/14/2021. (jeb)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Pursuant to Local Rule 83(d)(6), attorney Aimee Bataillon is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/14/2021. (jeb)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Danielle Opitz.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bataillon, Aimee)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kallstrom-Schreckengost on behalf of Danielle Opitz (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Conagra Brands, Inc..(Jensen, Marnie)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Marnie A. Jensen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 5/13/2021. (kjw)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4484921 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Conagra Brands, Inc.. (Jensen, Marnie)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryann A. Glenn on behalf of Conagra Brands, Inc. (Glenn, Ryann)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lewis Galloway. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 4/16/2021. (slg)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4460427 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Danielle Opitz. (Galloway, Lewis)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Conagra Brands, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4448910., filed by Danielle Opitz. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/6/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/6/2021.(Bataillon, Aimee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Opitz v. Conagra Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Ryann A. Glenn
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Represented By: Jenna Brofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Opitz
Represented By: Lewis Galloway
Represented By: Aimee C. Bataillon
Represented By: Lewis Michael Galloway
Represented By: Jessica Kallstrom-Schreckengost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?