Brule v. Palfinger USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Brule
Defendant: Palfinger USA, LLC, Omaha Standard, LLC a/k/a Omaha Standard Palfinger, Omaha Standard, LLC and Omaha Standard Palfinger
Case Number: 1:2023cv00024
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: William P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 11 Letter to Pottawattamie County Clerk of Court regarding remand of case. Case file sent by USPS this date. (nla)
November 3, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated. (nla)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Remanding Case. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 11/1/2023. (h)
October 26, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #8 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court Pottawattamie County by Omaha Standard, LLC, Palfinger USA, LLC. (Regennitter, Megan)
October 13, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court Pottawattamie County by Nicholas Brule.Motions referred to William P. Kelly. Responses due by 10/27/2023. (Pattermann, T.)
October 11, 2023 Filing 7 REPLY re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Omaha Standard, LLC, Palfinger USA, LLC.(Regennitter, Megan)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Omaha Standard, LLC, Palfinger USA, LLC. (Regennitter, Megan)
October 4, 2023 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nicholas Brule. Replies due by 10/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Pattermann, T.)
September 20, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Omaha Standard, LLC, Palfinger USA, LLC.(Regennitter, Megan)
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Omaha Standard, LLC, Palfinger USA, LLC. Responses due by 10/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Regennitter, Megan)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 10/10/2023. (btg)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Omaha Standard, LLC a/k/a Omaha Standard Palfinger, Palfinger USA, LLC from Iowa District Court for Pottawattamie County, case number LACV124137. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number AIASDC-5249277., filed by Omaha Standard, LLC a/k/a Omaha Standard Palfinger, Palfinger USA, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Original Notice, Petition and Jury Demand and Amended Petition at Law and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit 2 - Other Pleadings)(Regennitter, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brule v. Palfinger USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Brule
Represented By: T. J. Pattermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palfinger USA, LLC
Represented By: Julie Tomka Bittner
Represented By: Megan Marie Regennitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Standard, LLC a/k/a Omaha Standard Palfinger
Represented By: Julie Tomka Bittner
Represented By: Megan Marie Regennitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Standard, LLC
Represented By: Julie Tomka Bittner
Represented By: Megan Marie Regennitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Standard Palfinger
Represented By: Julie Tomka Bittner
Represented By: Megan Marie Regennitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?