United States of America v. Vande Voort et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Michael Vande Voort, Pottco Tactical Air, LLC and Pottco Airlease, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00033
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen H Locher
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 40101 Federal Aviation Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth A. Vasseur-Browne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 1/11/2024. (nla)
January 11, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America; Pottco Airlease, LLC waiver served on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; Pottco Tactical Air, LLC waiver served on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; Michael Vande Voort waiver served on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Scherle, Rachel)
January 10, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Pottco Airlease, LLC, Pottco Tactical Air, LLC. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
January 10, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Jury Trial Demanded by Pottco Airlease, LLC, Pottco Tactical Air, LLC, Michael Vande Voort.(Koltookian, Stephanie)
January 10, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5342842 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Pottco Airlease, LLC, Pottco Tactical Air, LLC, Michael Vande Voort. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
November 20, 2023 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (nla)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pottco Airlease, LLC, Pottco Tactical Air, LLC, Michael Vande Voort, filed by United States of America. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 2/15/2024. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/15/2024.(Scherle, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Vande Voort et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy Licht
Represented By: Rachel J. Scherle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Vande Voort
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Koltookian
Represented By: Elizabeth Vasseur-Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottco Tactical Air, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Koltookian
Represented By: Elizabeth Vasseur-Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pottco Airlease, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Koltookian
Represented By: Elizabeth Vasseur-Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?