Codling v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jolynn Codling
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00068
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
Office: Davenport Office
County: Scott
0 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
1 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case termed due to the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice #5 . (bp)
August 8, 2018 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jolynn Codling (Bribriesco, William)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 TEXT ORDER. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on August 21, 2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by August 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 8/6/2018. (dm) Modified on 8/6/2018 (bp - correct year and resent NEF).
June 28, 2018 3 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Weston, Benjamin)
June 28, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Weston, Benjamin)
June 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 7/26/2018. (kmc)
June 26, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Scott County District Court, case number LACE130336. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3530684., filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement)(Weston, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Codling v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolynn Codling
Represented By: Anthony John Bribriesco
Represented By: William J Bribriesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?