Montgomery v. General Atomics International Services Corporation

Plaintiff: John E Montogomery and John E Montgomery
Defendant: General Atomics International Services Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00090
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Iowa Southern District Court
0 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
1 Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 12 Featured Case TEXT ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: At the request of plaintiff's counsel, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be reset for November 14, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/7/2018. (jeb)
November 5, 2018 11 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Cunningham, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 10 Featured Case TEXT ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE: At the request of counsel, the parties shall have until 5:00 p.m. on Monday, November 5, 2018, to file their proposed scheduling order and discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/31/2018. (jeb)
October 26, 2018 9 Featured Case TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 7, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by November 2, 2018. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/26/2018. (jeb)
October 22, 2018 8 REPLY to Plaintiff's Resistance re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count I of the removed Petition filed by General Atomics International Services Corporation.(Cunningham, Thomas)
October 17, 2018 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by General Atomics International Services Corporation. (Olson, Ethan)
October 15, 2018 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count I of the removed Petition filed by John E Montgomery. Replies due by 10/22/2018.(Dial, Curtis)
September 28, 2018 5 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Unresisted Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. As requested, plaintiff shall have until October 15, 2018, to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #2 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 9/28/2018. (jeb)
September 27, 2018 4 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to motion to dismiss by John E Montgomery.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 10/11/2018. (Dial, Curtis)
September 17, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Defendant 10/17/2018. Court's 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Packet emailed to defense counsel. (dmh)
September 17, 2018 3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by General Atomics International Services Corporation.(Cunningham, Thomas)
September 17, 2018 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Count I of the removed Petition (Oral Argument Requested) by General Atomics International Services Corporation. Responses due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count I). (Cunningham, Thomas)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Atomics International Services Corporation d/b/a Cryotech Deicing Technology from Iowa District Court for Lee County at Fort Madison, case number LALA006676. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3597348., filed by General Atomics International Services Corporation d/b/a Cryotech Deicing Technology. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rule 81 Statement, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - State Court Petition and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Original Notice, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Transmittal of Service, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Marcel Danko in Support of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunningham, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. General Atomics International Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Montogomery
Represented By: Curtis R Dial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Montgomery
Represented By: Curtis R Dial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Atomics International Services Corporation
Represented By: Ethan S. Olson
Represented By: Thomas M Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?