Vegter Steel Fabrication LLC, LLC v. Calacci Construction Company
Plaintiff: VEGTER STEEL FABRICATION, LLC
Defendant: CALACCI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00093
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion to Continue Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 26, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/14/2018. (jeb)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue by Calacci Construction Company, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 11/28/2018. (Germaine, Jennifer)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Germaine, Jennifer)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 19, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by November 14, 2018. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/7/2018. (jeb)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Calacci Construction Company, Inc.. (Germaine, Jennifer)
November 1, 2018 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/29/2018. (rmj)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Calacci Construction Company, Inc..(Germaine, Jennifer)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Vegter Steel Fabrication, LLC re #1 Complaint, Partial Dismissal (Patterson, Benjamin)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ellen Germaine on behalf of Calacci Construction Company, Inc. (Germaine, Jennifer)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vegter Steel Fabrication, LLC re #1 Complaint, , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vegter Steel Fabrication, LLC. Calacci Construction Company, Inc. served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Patterson, Benjamin)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Vegter Steel Fabrication, LLC. (Patterson, Benjamin)
September 25, 2018 Set Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 10/16/2018. (rmj)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CALACCI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3605113., filed by VEGTER STEEL FABRICATION, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/24/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/24/2018.(Patterson, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vegter Steel Fabrication LLC, LLC v. Calacci Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALACCI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Germaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VEGTER STEEL FABRICATION, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin James Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?