American Piping Group, Inc. v. Calacci Construction Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: American Piping Group, Inc.
Defendant: Calacci Construction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00097
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
2 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
3 Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated, per pleading #8 . (bp)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Piping Group, Inc. (Patterson, Benjamin)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Calacci Construction Company, Inc.. (Germaine, Jennifer)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. As requested, defendant Calacci Construction Company, Inc. shall have until November 14, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 10/31/2018. (jeb)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Calacci Construction Company, Inc..Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Germaine, Jennifer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ellen Germaine on behalf of Calacci Construction Company, Inc. (Germaine, Jennifer)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Piping Group, Inc.. Calacci Construction Company, Inc. served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Patterson, Benjamin)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by American Piping Group, Inc.. (Patterson, Benjamin)
October 3, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 10/23/2018. (bp)
October 3, 2018 Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer and Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger no longer assigned to case. (kjw)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calacci Construction Company, Inc. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3612749., filed by American Piping Group, Inc.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/31/2018. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/31/2018.(Patterson, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Piping Group, Inc. v. Calacci Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Piping Group, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin James Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calacci Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Germaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?