James et al v. Walmart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael James, Julie James and Roberta James
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00107
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Stephen B Jackson
1 Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated per Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Removal #2 . (bp)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Walmart Stores, Inc. #1 Notice of Removal,. (Murphy, Kerrie)
October 29, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/28/2018. (bp)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Stores, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Clinton County, case number LACV045273. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3634463., filed by Walmart Stores, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Kerrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James
Represented By: Michael K Bush
Represented By: John C Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie James
Represented By: Michael K Bush
Represented By: John C Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta James
Represented By: Michael K Bush
Represented By: John C Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Kerrie M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?