Foster v. The Brock Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: Lexus S Foster and Lexus S. Foster
Defendant: The Brock Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00120
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated per pleading #4 . (bp)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: #3 Joint Stipulation to Submit Claims to Binding Arbitration. This matter is submitted to binding arbitration and dismissed. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 12/12/2018. (hfh)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Submit Claims to Binding Arbitration and to Dismiss (Joint) by The Brock Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sheffield, Robert)
December 6, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 1/4/2019. (bp)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by The Brock Group, Inc. to Plaintiff of Filing of Removal (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Notice of Removal)(Sheffield, Robert)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Brock Group, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Lee County, case number LALA006726. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3668578., filed by The Brock Group, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sheffield, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. The Brock Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexus S Foster
Represented By: Marc A Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexus S. Foster
Represented By: Marc A Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Brock Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Sheffield
Represented By: Robert A Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?