Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation v. Cornerstone Excavating, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation
Defendant: Cornerstone Excavating, Inc. and Daymen Threlkeld
Case Number: 3:2018cv00121
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER to of Service of Summons (executed by Defendant Threlkeld) by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (Helenhouse, James)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (Helenhouse, James)
December 10, 2018 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 12/27/2018. (bp)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3669461., filed by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 3/6/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/6/2019.(Helenhouse, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation v. Cornerstone Excavating, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Excavating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daymen Threlkeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation
Represented By: James D. Helenhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?