Whitford v. Alt et al
Plaintiff: Richard Whitford
Defendant: Debra Alt and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00125
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Stephen B Jackson
Referring Judge: John A Jarvey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Whitford. Debra Alt served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Fieweger, Stephen)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Whitford. (Fieweger, Stephen)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Whitford. (Fieweger, Stephen)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Whitford. Answer due 2/19/2019 (Fieweger, Stephen) Modified on 1/2/2019 added answer deadline to text(don).
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Whitford. United States of America served on 12/21/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Fieweger, Stephen)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3677330., filed by Richard Whitford. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 3/14/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/14/2019.(Fieweger, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitford v. Alt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Whitford
Represented By: Stephen T Fieweger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Alt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?