Radhey Lodging LLC v. AmGuard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Radhey Lodging LLC
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Company and Mullen Insurance Agency LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00003
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 Second REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Radhey Lodging LLC. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Radhey Lodging LLC. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Packet. Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Plaintiff is 3/26/2019. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Defendant Amguard Insurance Company is 4/5/2019. (dmh)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Parmenter, Mark)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Mullen Insurance Agency LLC. (OBrien, Sean)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radhey Lodging LLC. Mullen Insurance Agency LLC served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radhey Lodging LLC. AmGuard Insurance Company served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
February 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by J Michael Weston on behalf of AmGuard Insurance Company (Weston, J)
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J Parmenter on behalf of AmGuard Insurance Company (Parmenter, Mark)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 3/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 3/8/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/14/2019. (imk)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Mullen Insurance Agency LLC.(OBrien, Sean)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against AmGuard Insurance Company, Mullen Insurance Agency LLC., filed by Radhey Lodging LLC.(Bergmann, Benjamin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff may file their amended complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/17/2019. (imk)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Radhey Lodging LLC.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 1/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Bergmann, Benjamin)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 REPLY to re #2 Order, on Diversity of Parties by Radhey Lodging LLC. (Bergmann, Benjamin)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Complaint and Jury Demand. By 1/28/2019, Plaintiff shall submit to the Court the identification and citizenship for all members of Radhey Lodging LLC and shall allege the citizenship of Mullen Insurance Agency LLC. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 1/14/2019. (hfh)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3693666., filed by RADHEY LODGING LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/8/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/8/2019.(Bergmann, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radhey Lodging LLC v. AmGuard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radhey Lodging LLC
Represented By: Benjamin David Bergmann
Represented By: Beau Alvin Bergmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Company
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Represented By: Mark J Parmenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mullen Insurance Agency LLC
Represented By: Sean M OBrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?