Ortega v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jeanne Ortega
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00004
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referring Judge: Ross A Walters(R)
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Weston, J)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Weston, J)
January 10, 2019 Set Deadline: Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for Defendant 2/11/2019. Local Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Packet emailed to defense counsel. (dmh)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Scott County, case number LACE131082. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3694215., filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 Local Rule 81.a Statement)(Weston, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Weston
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Ortega
Represented By: Nicholas C. Rowley
Represented By: Dominic F Pechota
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?