Trustees of the NECA/Local 145 IBEW Pension Plan, as Collection Agent for All Fringe Benefits v. Vogele Electric, LLC

Plaintiff: Trustees of the NECA/Local 145 IBEW Pension Plan, as Collection Agent for All Fringe Benefits
Defendant: Vogele Electric, LLC, d/b/a Miller Electric and Vogele Electric, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00019
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
0 Judge: Celeste F Bremer
1 Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Trustees of the NECA/Local 145 IBEW Pension Plan, as Collection Agent for All Fringe Benefits. (Halpin, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 3/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Summons) (kmc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vogele Electric, LLC, d/b/a Miller Electric Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3737777., filed by Trustees of the NECA/Local 145 IBEW Pension Plan, as Collection Agent for All Fringe Benefits. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/20/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Halpin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the NECA/Local 145 IBEW Pension Plan, as Collection Agent for All Fringe Benefits v. Vogele Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vogele Electric, LLC, d/b/a Miller Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vogele Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the NECA/Local 145 IBEW Pension Plan, as Collection Agent for All Fringe Benefits
Represented By: Michael W Halpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?