Behning et al v. Westfield National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Terry Behning, Hailey Behning and Heidi Behning
Defendant: Westfield National Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00029
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Charles R Wolle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: oral argument on stipulated record will be held on 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone conference call placed to counsel of record by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. (alb)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue. The hearing previously scheduled to be held on 8/29/19 will instead be held by telephone conference call placed to counsel of record at 10:00 a.m. on 9/30/2019 10:00 AM by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 7/2/2019. (alb)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs' Uncontested Motion to Continue Oral Argument by Terry Behning.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/15/2019. (Woodward, Patrick)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF Plaintiff's Brief on Stipulated Facts and Reply to Defendant's Arguments by Terry Behning re #14 Brief/Other . (Woodward, Patrick)
June 26, 2019 Set Hearings: In Court Hearing/Oral Arguments on the Stipulated Record set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. (rmj)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER. Oral argument on the stipulated record will be held at 10:00 a.m. on 8/29/19 in Courtroom #455 at the U.S. Courthouse in Des Moines, Iowa. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle on 6/26/2019. (alb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Westfield National Insurance Company re #14 Brief/Other (Wallrichs, Brenda)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF ON STIPULATED FACTS by Westfield National Insurance Company re #12 Stipulation . (Wallrichs, Brenda)
May 3, 2019 Set Deadlines: Defendant's Brief due by 5/31/2019. Plaintiff's Brief due by 7/1/2019. Defendant's Reply Brief due by 7/23/2019. (bp)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting #11 Proposed Briefing Schedule. See order for particulars. As noted in the Order, all deadlines set in the Scheduling Order #8 filed on April 22, 2019, are now vacated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/2/2019. (imk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION OF FACTS by Westfield National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Joint Appendix)(Wallrichs, Brenda)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION Proposed Briefing Schedule by Westfield National Insurance Company.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 5/16/2019. (Wallrichs, Brenda)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See order for particulars. Status Conference set for 6/19/2019 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 8/20/2019 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 10/18/2019 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 2/18/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 4/20/2020 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/22/2019. (imk)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/22/2019. (imk)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting #6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 5/31/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 6/17/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/17/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/17/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/17/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 10/17/2019. Discovery Deadline 12/17/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline 1/17/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2020 09:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle. Estimated length of four days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/22/2019. (imk)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/22/2019. Attorney Patrick Woodward appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Brenda Wallrichs appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 11:00 minutes. (imk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Weston, J)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Westfield National Insurance Company. (Weston, J)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 4/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 4/17/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/26/2019. (imk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant Westfield National Insurance Company's Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Petition at Law ANSWER to Complaint by Westfield National Insurance Company.(Weston, J)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Packet, Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 4/18/2019. (bp)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Westfield National Insurance Company from Scott County, case number LACE131349. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3769194., filed by Westfield National Insurance Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 LR 81.a Statement)(Weston, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behning et al v. Westfield National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Behning
Represented By: Patrick L Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hailey Behning
Represented By: Patrick L Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Behning
Represented By: Patrick L Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield National Insurance Company
Represented By: Brenda K Wallrichs
Represented By: J Michael Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?