Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp. et al v. City of Clinton, Iowa et al
Plaintiff: Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp., Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation and Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation doing business as Canadian Pacific
Defendant: Mark Vulich, Bill Schemers, Cody Seeley, City of Clinton, Iowa, Robert Milroy, Seth Odor, Sean Connell, City of Clinton City Council, Lynn McGraw, Matthew Brooke, Julie Allesee, City Council of the City of Clinton, Iowa and Paul Gassman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00034
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:10101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmh)
April 17, 2019 Filing 35 MANDATE of USCA as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (vr)
April 17, 2019 Filing 34 JUDGMENT of USCA advising the joint stipulation of the parties for dismissal of the appeal is granted. The appeal is dismissed as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. Mandate to issue forthwith. (vr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation (Finley, Kerry)
April 4, 2019 Filing 32 USCA Scheduling Order as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (vr)
April 4, 2019 Filing 31 USCA Case Number 19-1700 for #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (vr)
April 4, 2019 Filing 30 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA Supplement by District Court Clerk to USCA re #29 Notice of Appeal filed on 4/3/2019. (vr)
April 3, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #28 Order on Motion for TRO by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. Fee paid in the amount of $505 receipt number 0863-3784393. (Finley, Kerry)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO. See attached order for particulars. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 4/3/2019. (cmm)
April 3, 2019 Filing 27 BRIEF Defendants' Post-Hearing Brief by Julie Allesee, Matthew Brooke, City Council of the City of Clinton, Iowa, City of Clinton, Iowa, Sean Connell, Paul Gassman, Lynn McGraw, Robert Milroy, Seth Odor, Bill Schemers, Cody Seeley, Mark Vulich . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(OConnell, Patrick)
April 3, 2019 Filing 26 Supplemental Exhibits 7 and 8 to #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Requested Expedited Relief filed by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8). (Finley, Kerry) Modified on 4/3/2019 to correct event from Motion to Amend to Supplemental Exhibits and term motion. (dmh)
April 2, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge James E. Gritzner: Motion Hearing held on 4/2/2019 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Requested Expedited Relief filed by Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation, Canadian Pacific. Parties present evidence and arguments on Motion. Court takes matter under advisement. See attached minute entry for particulars. Time in court: 3 hours, 23 minutes. (Court Reporter SueAnn Jones.) (cmm)
April 2, 2019 Filing 24 RECEIPT FOR DEFENDANTS' EXHIBITS picked up. (cmm)
April 2, 2019 Filing 23 RECEIPT FOR PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS picked up. (cmm)
April 2, 2019 Filing 22 Witness & Exhibit List re: hearing on motion for temporary restraining order. (cmm)
April 2, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Cody Seeley served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Matthew Brooke served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Lynn McGraw served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Sean Connell served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Mark Vulich served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Julie Allesee served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. City of Clinton City Council served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Bill Schemers served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Robert Milroy served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Seth Odor served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. City of Clinton, Iowa served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Paul Gassman served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Finley, Kerry)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Kooker on behalf of All Defendants (Kooker, Nathan)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick John OConnell on behalf of All Defendants (OConnell, Patrick)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Requested Expedited Relief. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Senior Judge James E. Gritzner. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 4/1/2019. (cmm)
April 1, 2019 Senior Judge James E. Gritzner added. Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (don)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David F. Rifkind. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/1/2019. (kjw)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. (Finley, Kerry)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3780880 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. (Finley, Kerry)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Requested Expedited Relief by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Responses due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kerry A. Finley, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Kerry A. Finley)(Finley, Kerry)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julie Allesee, Matthew Brooke, City of Clinton City Council, City of Clinton, Iowa, Sean Connell, Lynn McGraw, Robert Milroy, Seth Odor, Bill Schemers, Cody Seeley, Mark Vulich Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3780858., filed by Canadian Pacific, Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/1/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H to Complaint)(Finley, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp. et al v. City of Clinton, Iowa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Vulich
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Schemers
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Seeley
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clinton, Iowa
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Milroy
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Odor
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Connell
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clinton City Council
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn McGraw
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Brooke
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Allesee
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Council of the City of Clinton, Iowa
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gassman
Represented By: Patrick John OConnell
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canadian Pacific
Represented By: David F. Rifkind
Represented By: Kerry Ann Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corp.
Represented By: David F. Rifkind
Represented By: Kerry Ann Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation
Represented By: David F. Rifkind
Represented By: Kerry Ann Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation doing business as Canadian Pacific
Represented By: David F. Rifkind
Represented By: Kerry Ann Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?