US Foods, Inc. v. Maingredient, LLC
Plaintiff: U.S. Foods, Inc and US Foods, Inc.
Defendant: Maingredient, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00039
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Celeste F Bremer
Referring Judge: Stephanie M Rose
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Maingredient, LLC. (kmc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Entry in re Maingredient, LLC by US Foods, Inc.. Responses due by 7/11/2019. (McMonagle, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by US Foods, Inc. , SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Foods, Inc.. Maingredient, LLC served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (McMonagle, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maingredient, LLC., filed by US Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McMonagle, Robert)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by US Foods, Inc.. (McMonagle, Robert)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 5/28/2019. (rmj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: #1 Summons) (rmj).
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maingredient. LLC. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3818214., filed by US Foods, Inc. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 8/12/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McMonagle, Robert) Modified on 5/13/2019 (rmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Foods, Inc. v. Maingredient, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maingredient, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Foods, Inc
Represented By: Robert Blake McMonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Blake McMonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?