Brus v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc
Plaintiff: Debbie Brus
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00041
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: Robert W Pratt
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Debbie Brus; Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc waiver served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Hoeffel, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph C. Hoeffel. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/6/2019. (kjw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3838025 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Debbie Brus. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A- Court Admissions, #3 Exhibit B- Certificates of Good Standing)(Hoeffel, Joseph)
June 5, 2019 Filing fee: $ 453.00, receipt number IAS400021330 by attorney Joel Fenton. (kjw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Summons) (rmj)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Debbie Brus. (Fenton, Joel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3821841., filed by Debbie Brus. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 8/14/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenton, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brus v. Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Brus
Represented By: Joel E Fenton
Represented By: Joseph C. Hoeffel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Adjustment Service, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?