Kearns et al v. Rideout
Plaintiff: Jeffery Dettbarn, Patrick M Kearns and Patrick M. Kearns
Defendant: David Rideout
Case Number: 3:2019cv00042
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Due to court conflicts, the Motion Hearing originally set for 7/26/2019 8 is continued to 7/29/2019 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/22/2019. (imk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to #4 Motion for Substitution and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion Re Discovery by David Rideout. (Attachments: #1 David Rideout Declaration). (Faith, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to #7 . Although Defendant has not provided any reason or justification for an extension of time, the Court grants the request. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/3/2019. (k)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [#7]Plaintiffs' Resistance to [#4] Motion for Substitution and Motion Re Discovery by David Rideout. Motion referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/16/2019. (Faith, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING RE: #4 Motion to Substitute Party. A Motion Hearing is set for 7/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 460 - 4th Floor North before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. The hearing will not exceed one hour in length. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/2/2019. (imk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Substitute Party United States for Defendant David Rideout filed by Jeffery Dettbarn, Patrick M. Kearns. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Brief, #2 Affidavit of Jeff Dettbarn, #3 Affidavit of Patrick Kearns)(Johnson, Glenn)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs shall file their resistance to to the Motion for Substitution by 6/28/2019. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/11/2019. (imk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consent by Jeffery Dettbarn, Patrick M. Kearns.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 6/24/2019. (Johnson, Glenn)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Party United States for Defendant David Rideout by David Rideout.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certification of Scope of Employment)(Faith, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Sealed Document. Letter to counsel re former practice. (nlh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by David Rideout re #1 Notice of Removal by USA Local Rule 81.1 List (Faith, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL BY USA by David Rideout from Iowa District Court for Johnson County, case number LACV080800., filed by David Rideout. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Faith, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearns et al v. Rideout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Dettbarn
Represented By: Glenn L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M Kearns
Represented By: Glenn L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M. Kearns
Represented By: Glenn L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rideout
Represented By: David L.D. Faith
Represented By: William C Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?