Campbell v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company et al
Plaintiff: Edgar T. Campbell
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Company and Lisa Culberson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00044
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Helen C Adams
Referring Judge: James E Gritzner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441wc
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See order for more particulars. Status Conference set for 10/10/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 2/14/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 4/2/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 6/3/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/10/2019. (imk)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/10/2019. (imk)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 7/26/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 8/5/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/5/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/4/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/4/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 1/3/2020. Discovery Deadline 3/5/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 4/3/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2020 10:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 09:00 AM in Davenport Courthouse before Senior Judge James E. Gritzner. Estimated length of five days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/10/2019. (imk) (Main Document 10 replaced on 7/12/2019) (imk).
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 7/10/2019. Attorney Stuart Higgins failed to appear for plaintiff. Chambers tried to contact Mr. Higgins by phone, to no avail. Attorneys Katelynn Williams and Brandon Lobberecht appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 13 minutes. (imk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Shaff, Martha)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Scheduling Conference shall be held on 7/10/2019 at 9:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. Counsel outside of Des Moines may attend telephonically. If they choose to do so, counsel should call 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 1176783 at the prompt to be joined with the call. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 7/5/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/19/2019. (imk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel A. Kaplan; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Katelynn M. Williams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/19/2019. (slg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3848139 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Lisa Culberson, Kraft Heinz Foods Company. (Shaff, Martha)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3848129 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Lisa Culberson, Kraft Heinz Foods Company. (Shaff, Martha)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Defendants' Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lisa Culberson, Kraft Heinz Foods Company.(Shaff, Martha)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Errata Exhibit A - Dismissal without Prejudice re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Lisa Culberson. (Shaff, Martha)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Lisa Culberson from District Court of Scott County, case number LACE131639. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3842782., filed by Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Lisa Culberson. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Notice, Petition and Amended Petition, #2 Declaration, #3 Local Rule 81.1 Compliance, #4 Corporate Disclosure)(Shaff, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Represented By: Martha L Shaff
Represented By: Katelynn M. Williams
Represented By: Daniel A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Culberson
Represented By: Martha L Shaff
Represented By: Katelynn M. Williams
Represented By: Daniel A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar T. Campbell
Represented By: Stuart L Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?